CARE NETWORK CAMBRIDGESHIRE

Charity number: 1120693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Mary Ellington Trustee 08 June 2018 None on record
Margaret Pearce Higgins Trustee 26 April 2019
THE COTTON HALL FOUNDATION Received: On time
William Alexander Mortimer Trustee 13 January 2017 None on record
Gemma Barron Trustee 26 March 2020 None on record
Jill Worth Trustee 07 April 2017 None on record
Michael John Hill Trustee 26 March 2020 None on record