LONGRIDGE ON THE THAMES

Charity number: 1121239
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 18 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 18 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 02 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 02 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 30 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 30 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 10 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 10 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 15 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 15 August 2017 On time Download