Trustees DOWNRIGHT EXCELLENT

Charity number: 1120863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Davis Chair 30 January 2020
None on record
Mark Lewis Sheinfield Trustee 24 May 2022
None on record
Melody Yue Liang Trustee 27 January 2022
None on record
Eoghan Beecher Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Christina Clare Leath Trustee 28 January 2021
None on record
RAJEELAN THAYALASEELAN Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Anasuyer Iyer Trustee 30 January 2020
None on record
Nishad Gudhka Trustee 28 September 2013
None on record