MEDINA GHOSIA EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1121982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £12.38k £9.94k £16.52k £16.94k £21.15k
Total expenditure £10.30k £11.31k £18.73k £14.63k £18.34k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A