THE COMPANY OF ARTS SCHOLARS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1121954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HILLARY BAUER Trustee 17 May 2018
TOWNER Received: On time
BEN URI GALLERY AND MUSEUM LIMITED Received: 144 days late
JOHN HEDLEY SPANNER TD Trustee 18 July 2012 None on record
TOM GERALD CHRISTOPHERSON Trustee 11 July 2012 None on record
JOHN LESLIE BARBER Trustee 19 January 2017
HOUSE MILL TRUST LTD
MARK CHARLES PRENTICE BRIDGE Trustee 27 January 2014
THE BRIGHTLING VILLAGE TRUST Received: On time
Richard Hinchcliffe Aydon Trustee 19 January 2017 None on record
DAVID JOHN MANNERS NEEDHAM Trustee None on record