ELECTRIC STORM YOUTH LIMITED

Charity number: 1121106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £73.97k £91.05k £85.84k £160.53k £133.38k
Total expenditure £57.23k £77.64k £82.12k £81.65k £122.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £24.12k