AISHA WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1122513
Charity reporting is overdue by 335 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 Overdue Overdue by 335 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Overdue Overdue by 335 days
Annual return 28 February 2019 02 March 2020 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 25 April 2019 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 01 March 2018 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 07 March 2017 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required