AISHA WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1122513
Charity reporting is overdue by 340 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2015 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019
Total gross income £8.12k £16.16k £6.72k £12.51k £2.74k
Total expenditure £7.09k £38.46k £8.11k £10.10k £112
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A