ANIMAL PROTECTION AGENCY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1123569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £7.84k £29.07k £28.91k £9.08k £3.85k
Total expenditure £19.32k £17.69k £17.31k £19.08k £16.71k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A