WOMEN FOR REFUGEE WOMEN

Charity number: 1121174
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 471 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 471 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 836 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 836 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 February 2018 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 October 2016 On time
Annual return 31 March 2015 12 October 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 12 October 2015 On time