WOMEN FOR REFUGEE WOMEN

Charity number: 1121174
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £157.44k £170.46k £210.83k £259.57k £0
Total expenditure £141.98k £178.14k £164.23k £230.08k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0