ST ALBANS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1122405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £458.85k £555.16k £538.95k £605.80k £636.45k
Total expenditure £431.72k £467.60k £534.30k £595.96k £618.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £103.30k £195.35k £104.33k £241.91k £8.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £10.47k £942 £1.78k £1.24k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £156.65k £127.67k £190.07k £260.74k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £385.28k £407.90k £412.39k £371.70k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £2.77k £2.25k £1.57k £2.77k
Income - Other N/A £0 £200 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £10.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £467.60k £534.30k £595.96k £618.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £9.52k £10.55k £10.41k £10.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0