MANCHESTER LITERATURE FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1121276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £225.56k £254.57k £212.29k £231.01k £240.55k
Total expenditure £212.88k £240.21k £210.64k £248.17k £278.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.50k £12.50k £12.50k £14.50k £12.50k