CHARITY VOICE

Charity number: 1122164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 June 2020 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 01 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 01 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 04 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 04 September 2017 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required