Accounts and annual returns RIVERSIDE SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1121363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 July 2022 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 08 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 05 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window