ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND FIRST SCHOOL, MINEHEAD P T A

Charity number: 1121725
Charity reporting is overdue by 453 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 88 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 88 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 453 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 453 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 February 2020 226 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 14 September 2018 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 06 November 2018 129 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 November 2017 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required