ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND FIRST SCHOOL, MINEHEAD P T A

Charity number: 1121725
Charity reporting is overdue by 445 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £24.39k £3.92k £3.99k £35.67k £20.36k
Total expenditure £52.54k £5.83k £2.82k £33.67k £20.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A