THE SOCIAL RESEARCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1123940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £399.22k £449.00k £521.42k £571.43k £457.78k
Total expenditure £342.50k £419.29k £477.51k £606.87k £466.54k
Income from government contracts £8.69k £70.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £6.89k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £79.15k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £455.79k £492.29k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £13 £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £65.62k £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £477.51k £606.87k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £5.17k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A