PEARL OF AFRICA CHILD CARE LIMITED

Charity number: 1122809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £168.82k £161.22k £186.33k £86.27k £180.08k
Total expenditure £139.45k £187.13k £187.58k £116.95k £126.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A