PEARL OF AFRICA CHILD CARE LIMITED

Charity number: 1122809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Tonge Trustee 24 July 2018
ROTARY CLUB OF ORMSKIRK CLOCK TOWER TRUST FUND Recently registered
ROBIN GRANT WHAITE Chair None on record
Rosemary Byass Trustee 31 August 2019 None on record
Leonie Claire Bell Trustee 01 June 2020 None on record
Elizabeth Angela Tonge Trustee 24 July 2017 None on record
Becs Brocken Trustee 25 May 2014 None on record