RAFFA INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT AGENCY

Charity number: 1123089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.62k £12.47k £13.42k £14.30k £7.49k
Total expenditure £8.31k £9.41k £8.98k £18.38k £7.07k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A