RAFFA INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT AGENCY

Charity number: 1123089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Laing Trustee 18 November 2020 None on record
BISHOP WILTON RALPH OBE POWELL Chair None on record
Maxine Douglas Trustee 01 February 2018 None on record
TEDROY MILTON POWELL Trustee 31 December 2016
THE MENS ROOM TRUST Received: On time
Rev RAYMOND VEIRA Trustee 30 July 2013
CHURCH OF GOD OF PROPHECY TRUST Received: On time
NILAARI AGENCY Received: On time
LLEWELLYN FITZROY GRAHAM Trustee None on record
Rev MICHAEL WILSON Trustee
COUNCIL OF BLACK MAJORITY CHURCHES Received: On time
Michelle Laing Trustee 18 November 2020 None on record
Monica Coke Trustee 10 December 2013 None on record
Susan Graham Trustee 03 December 2018 None on record
BISHOP BASIL RICHARDS Trustee None on record