Accounts and annual returns THE ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF THE ASCENSION AND ST CHAD, RUGBY

Charity number: 1122061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window