Financial history THE ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF THE ASCENSION AND ST CHAD, RUGBY

Charity number: 1122061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £28.98k £19.89k £25.96k £13.99k £11.67k
Total expenditure £17.28k £27.97k £18.15k £16.95k £15.78k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A