FOREST OF AVON TRUST

Charity number: 1122314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MATTHEW RICHARD JOSEPH JONES Trustee 16 April 2018 None on record
NIGEL LESLIE HOWE Trustee None on record
Alister Rankine Trustee 09 November 2020 None on record
Pamela Margaret Gilder Trustee 01 June 2020 None on record
Charles Giles Clarke Trustee 04 November 2021 None on record
KEITH EDWARD BETTON Chair None on record
James Joseph Mayer Trustee 04 November 2021 None on record
Charles Davies Trustee 24 November 2021 None on record
CHRIS BLOOR Trustee 28 April 2014 None on record
Sara Blackmore Trustee 04 November 2021 None on record
Robert Edward John Bernays Trustee 04 November 2021
COLSTON'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION Received: On time
MRS G B TRUST Received: On time
BERNAYS CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
KATHERINE'S COCK A DOODLE - 'DO!' TRUST Received: On time