SOUTHSIDE YOUNG LEADERS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1121717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £194.84k £158.32k £145.63k £163.17k £208.29k
Total expenditure £174.73k £192.28k £170.13k £150.58k £170.68k
Income from government contracts £10.00k £0 N/A £1.30k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £5.00k N/A £1.30k N/A