SOUTHSIDE YOUNG LEADERS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1121717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Samuel Osei-Sarkodie Trustee 20 February 2020 None on record
Shaida Kwapong Trustee 20 February 2020 None on record
Alan Gordon McDougall Trustee 12 January 2019 None on record
David Earl Rowe-Francis Trustee 05 August 2017 None on record
Annemarieke Murthi Trustee 29 June 2019 None on record
Claire Angela Martin Trustee 06 April 2019 None on record
Ofei Kwafo-Akoto Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
Winston Davis Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record