THE DONALD GORDON THIRD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1122870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £3.04k £3.27k £3.61k £3.50k £3.35k
Total expenditure £3.04k £3.28k £3.62k £3.50k £3.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A