BONYAD TOOS (TOOS FOUNDATION)

Charity number: 1125857
Charity reporting is overdue by 82 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £304.76k £131.13k £226.37k £90.27k £88.25k
Total expenditure £314.38k £135.86k £221.56k £83.33k £64.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A