BONYAD TOOS (TOOS FOUNDATION)

Charity number: 1125857
Charity reporting is up to date (82 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 September 2021 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 September 2021 82 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 December 2020 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 01 December 2020 154 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 January 2020 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 27 January 2020 211 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 23 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 13 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 13 March 2017 On time Download