MOISHE BAMBERGER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1122999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time Download