EAST LONDON BUSINESS ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1122173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.01m £3.87m £3.69m £3.25m £3.29m
Total expenditure £3.89m £4.09m £3.82m £3.15m £3.18m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £118.75k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £470.00k £170.00k N/A £185.25k £239.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.09m £821.48k £812.49k £764.84k £738.14k
Income - Other trading activities £1.24m £1.60m £1.44m £1.06m £1.03m
Income - Charitable activities £1.63m £1.41m £1.43m £1.42m £1.51m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.16k £5.21k £5.41k £4.95k £1.85k
Income - Other £52.89k £29.30k £2.80k £3.08k £10.96k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.62m £2.45m £2.37m £2.17m £2.27m
Expenditure - Raising funds £36.73k £20.11k £20.35k £20.39k £20.42k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.24m £1.61m £1.42m £951.24k £894.99k