Financial history FOSCOLO APPEAL FUND

Charity number: 1123769
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £1.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £40 £40 £40 £40
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A