NEW WORLD INTERNATIONAL (UK)

Charity number: 1126542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.97k £7.00k £9.60k £5.10k £9.89k
Total expenditure £5.21k £6.90k £9.03k £5.03k £9.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A