Accounts and annual returns MADANIA WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1123338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 September 2021 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 08 September 2021 100 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 June 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 12 June 2020 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 29 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 29 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 28 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 28 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window