Financial history MADANIA WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1123338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £71.68k £72.04k £40.89k £75.45k £129.17k
Total expenditure £48.18k £64.13k £100.74k £41.99k £53.25k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A