COMUNIDADE EVANGELICA SARA NOSSA TERRA

Charity number: 1122255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 10 January 2008: Standard registration
  • 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 03 August 2011: Re-registered
  • 09 June 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 14 June 2013: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • GOSPEL UNION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property