GLOBAL IMPACT INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY

Charity number: 1123394
Charity reporting is up to date (123 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 March 2021 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 March 2021 123 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 April 2020 182 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 12 December 2016 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required