GLOBAL IMPACT INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY

Charity number: 1123394
Charity reporting is up to date (123 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £22.52k £22.92k £21.24k £38.54k £56.90k
Total expenditure £22.69k £22.86k £24.83k £39.67k £111.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A