Financial history THE ALFRETON PARTY IN THE PARK

Charity number: 1125758
Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £26.36k £13.63k £14.89k £0 £0
Total expenditure £24.50k £14.82k £15.28k £592 £520
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.90k N/A £600 N/A N/A