SHINE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1122828
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 November 2020 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 November 2020 28 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 16 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 16 October 2016 On time Download