Accounts and annual returns AFFIRMING CATHOLICISM

Charity number: 1122906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 21 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 21 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 17 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required