Accounts and annual returns SIMPLY A POUND LIMITED

Charity number: 1123142
Charity reporting is overdue by 544 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 179 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 179 days
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 544 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 544 days
Annual return 31 May 2019 02 April 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 02 April 2020 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 31 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 01 April 2019 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required