SIMPLY A POUND LIMITED

Charity number: 1123142
Charity reporting is overdue by 123 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019
Total gross income £3.83k £8.86k £2.72k £33.62k £65.00k
Total expenditure £4.18k £8.85k £2.47k £33.63k £64.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A