PEACE DIRECT

Charity number: 1123241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.82m £1.82m £3.10m £3.97m £3.81m
Total expenditure £1.67m £1.91m £2.91m £3.44m £3.73m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £450.30k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £857.65k £429.75k £1.52m £113.02k £77.66k
Income - Donations and legacies £310.39k £366.17k £515.54k £792.84k £770.65k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.51m £1.45m £2.57m £3.18m £3.04m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £18
Income - Other £1.02k £531 £5.87k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £74.75k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.45m £1.70m £2.64m £3.09m £3.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £208.43k £269.00k £348.48k £366.05k
Expenditure - Governance £10.46k £7.29k £6.67k £13.80k £12.88k
Expenditure - Grants institution £815.83k £0 £1.62m £1.21m £1.62m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £62.12k