PEACE DIRECT

Charity number: 1123241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David George Loyn Trustee 13 December 2018 None on record
Dr Belinda Mary Riddall Bell Trustee 26 March 2020 None on record
Niamh Neville Trustee 26 June 2014 None on record
Jennifer Ashawa Larbie Trustee 16 December 2020 None on record
NICHOLAS MOULE WHITAKER Trustee 05 December 2019
MCS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE UNITED KINGDOM ENVIRONMENTAL LAW ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Anthony Donald Raymond Smith Chair 28 June 2018 None on record
David Ian CUTLER Trustee 22 March 2018 None on record
Kessy EKOMO SOIGNET Trustee 29 April 2021 None on record
Stacey Lyenne Haefele Trustee 30 June 2020 None on record