MITZVAH DAY UK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1125682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £192.67k £176.16k £196.49k £199.96k £188.63k
Total expenditure £168.47k £188.00k £192.36k £224.93k £187.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.00k £7.30k £3.65k £1.00k