MITZVAH DAY UK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1125682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Judy Mizrahi Trustee 20 September 2018 None on record
Peter Oppenheimer Trustee 26 March 2019
THE ANNA FREUD CENTRE Received: On time
Edwin Shuker Trustee 09 December 2018
SEPHARDI VOICES UK Received: On time
Lee Sidney Trustee 09 February 2015 None on record
Debra Morris Trustee 29 May 2019 None on record
Laura Marks OBE Chair
SWEET CHARITY (LONDON) LIMITED Received: On time
THE JEWISH LEADERSHIP COUNCIL Received: On time
Commonwealth Jewish Council Received: On time