KAMYABI

Charity number: 1125243
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is overdue by 52 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 52 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 52 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 13 January 2020 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 04 January 2019 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 23 November 2017 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required