SHREE SHREE LOKNATH BHAKTA PORISHAD (UK)

Charity number: 1124272
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 March 2021 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 June 2019 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 February 2018 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 March 2017 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required